Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Fishing Nets and Devices

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0446 (SB0186)
Title
Natural Resources - Invasive Blue Catfish Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0893 (SB0076)
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1249 (SB0960)
Title
Natural Resources - Blue Catfish - Population Control
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0076 (HB0893)
Title
Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Administrative Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0186 (HB0446)
Title
Natural Resources - Invasive Blue Catfish Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0960 (HB1249)
Title
Natural Resources - Blue Catfish - Population Control
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0446 (SB0186) Natural Resources - Invasive Blue Catfish Pilot Program Delegate Morgan, T. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0893 (SB0076) Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Administrative Penalties Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1249 (SB0960) Natural Resources - Blue Catfish - Population Control Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0076 (HB0893) Tidal Fish Licenses - Oyster Authorizations - Administrative Penalties Senator Bailey 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0186 (HB0446) Natural Resources - Invasive Blue Catfish Pilot Program Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0960 (HB1249) Natural Resources - Blue Catfish - Population Control Senator Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/4/2025 11:07 AM
Click to return on the top page