Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Foreclosure

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0058 (SB0117)
Title
Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0852 /CH0382
Title
Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1009 (SB0724)
Title
Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 (HB0058)
Title
Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154 (HB0018/CH0746)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0457 (HB1196)
Title
Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 (HB1009)
Title
Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0058 (SB0117) Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
HB0852 /CH0382 Property Tax - Tax Sales - Homeowner Protection Program Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 382
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1009 (SB0724) Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0117 (HB0058) Workgroup on Minority Homeownership, Neighborhood Revitalization, and Household Wealth Equity Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0154 (HB0018/CH0746) Landlord and Tenant - Residential Tenants - Access to Counsel Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0457 (HB1196) Commercial Law – Credit Regulation – Reverse Mortgage Loans Act – Revisions Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0724 (HB1009) Mortgage Servicers - Requirements and Prohibitions During and After a State of Emergency and Catastrophic Health Emergency (Foreclosure Relief Act of 2021) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:23 AM
Click to return on the top page