Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Foreign Ownership

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0053
Title
Task Force to Study E-Commerce Monopolies in the State (E-Commerce Antimonopoly Study of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Wu
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0252 /CH0121
Title
Insurance - Holding Companies - Group Capital Calculation and Liquidity Stress Test
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0616 (SB0392)
Title
Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests
Sponsor
Delegate Munoz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Procurement - Scrutinized Entities - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007 (SB0766)
Title
Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Right to Start Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0392 (HB0616)
Title
Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0766 (HB1007)
Title
Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0053 Task Force to Study E-Commerce Monopolies in the State (E-Commerce Antimonopoly Study of 2024) Delegate Wu 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0252 /CH0121 Insurance - Holding Companies - Group Capital Calculation and Liquidity Stress Test Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 121
Economic Matters
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/19/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0616 (SB0392) Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests Delegate Munoz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0894 Procurement - Scrutinized Entities - Prohibition Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 12:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB1007 (SB0766) Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024 Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111) Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 934
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1314 Corporations and Associations - Annual Reports - Filing Fees (Right to Start Act) Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0392 (HB0616) Agricultural Land - Adversarial Foreign Governments - Restrictions on Property Interests Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0766 (HB1007) Fair Share for Maryland Act of 2024 Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934) Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page