Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Foreign Trade -see also- International Affairs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172
Title
Corporate Income Tax – Combined Reporting and Subtraction Modification for Combined Groups of Corporations
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0369
Title
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 (SB0624)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0123
Title
Small Business Fairness Act
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0339
Title
Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development
Sponsor
President
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0511
Title
Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 (HB0638)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0172 Corporate Income Tax – Combined Reporting and Subtraction Modification for Combined Groups of Corporations Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/28/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0369 Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Ways and Means
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0638 (SB0624) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0123 Small Business Fairness Act Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0339 Department of Commerce - Sister-State Relationships - Maintenance and Development President 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2021 - 11:30 AM
SB0511 Corporate Tax Fairness Act of 2021 Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0624 (HB0638) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2021 1:25 PM
Click to return on the top page