Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Foresters

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0876
Title
Maryland Forestry Education Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1031 (SB0791)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1140 /CH0475 (SB0695/CH0476)
Title
Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601
Title
Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 /CH0476 (HB1140/CH0475)
Title
Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1031)
Title
Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0876 Maryland Forestry Education Fund – Establishment Delegate Stein 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1031 (SB0791) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1140 /CH0475 (SB0695/CH0476) Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 475
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0601 Baltimore City Soil Conservation District - Establishment - Requirements Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0695 /CH0476 (HB1140/CH0475) Natural Resources - Voluntary Firewood Treatment Certification Program - Establishment Senator Carozza 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0791 (HB1031) Natural Resources - Land Conservation - Establishment of Goals and Programs (Maryland the Beautiful Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 3:18 PM
Click to return on the top page