Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0502 (SB0456)
Title
Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0059
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 (SB0760)
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0456 (HB0502)
Title
Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0760 (HB1080)
Title
Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0488 Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0502 (SB0456) Office of the State’s Attorney – Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0670 /CH0059 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1080 (SB0760) Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0456 (HB0502) Office of the State's Attorney - Collection and Publication of Prosecutorial Information Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0760 (HB1080) Criminal Law – Animal Cruelty – Petition for Costs for Care of Seized Animal Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:17 PM
Click to return on the top page