Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Forfeiture

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1033 (SB0987)
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1197
Title
Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0987 (HB1033)
Title
Business Regulation – Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers – Certifications
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934)
Title
Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1033 (SB0987) Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1063 /CH0934 (SB1111) Criminal Organizations - Underlying Crime Delegate Williams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 934
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1197 Business Regulation - Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers - Certifications Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0987 (HB1033) Business Regulation – Electronic Smoking Devices Manufacturers – Certifications Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1111 (HB1063/CH0934) Criminal Organizations - Criminal Prohibitions, Civil Actions, and Forfeiture Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page