Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Forgery

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0969 (SB0688)
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hixson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0018
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0969)
Title
Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308)
Title
Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0969 (SB0688) Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Hixson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1289 /CH0308 (SB0941) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 308
Judiciary
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0018 State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0688 (HB0969) Labor and Employment - Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 (HB1289/CH0308) Maryland Uniform Interstate Family Support Act - Revision Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page