Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Fuel Tax

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054
Title
Motor Fuel Tax - Downward Adjustment - Decrease in Consumer Price Index
Sponsor
Delegate Vitale
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 (SB0625)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1067 (SB0664)
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0765)
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0554)
Title
Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1067)
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0765 (HB1331)
Title
Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 Motor Fuel Tax - Downward Adjustment - Decrease in Consumer Price Index Delegate Vitale 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 (SB0625) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1067 (SB0664) Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1331 (SB0765) Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0625 (HB0554) Commission on Tax Policy, Reform, and Fairness Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
SB0664 (HB1067) Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0765 (HB1331) Transportation - Motor Fuel Tax and Highway User Revenue - Increased Local Share Senator Colburn 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/05/2014 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page