Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Gangs

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093
Title
Courts - Evidence - Membership in or Association With a Criminal Gang
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0461 (SB0388)
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0388 (HB0461)
Title
Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312)
Title
Justice Reinvestment Act
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0093 Courts - Evidence - Membership in or Association With a Criminal Gang Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0461 (SB0388) Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1312 (SB1005/CH0515) Justice Reinvestment Act Speaker 6 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/04/2016 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
SB0161 /CH0658 (HB0336/CH0619) Criminal Procedure - Seizure and Forfeiture Senator Hough 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 658
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0388 (HB0461) Crimes - Criminal Gangs - Prohibitions and Funding President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1005 /CH0515 (HB1312) Justice Reinvestment Act President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 515
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page