Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Genetics

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 /CH0571 (SB0637/CH0570)
Title
Evidence - Admissibility of DNA Profile - Definition and Validation of DNA Profile
Sponsor
Delegate Sophocleus
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0732 (SB0153)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 /CH0124
Title
Newborn Infant Screening - Testing by Nonpublic Laboratories - Notification
Sponsor
Delegate O'Donnell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0956 (SB0741)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1392
Title
Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0153 (HB0732)
Title
Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0637 /CH0570 (HB0641/CH0571)
Title
Evidence - Admissibility of DNA Profile - Definition and Validation of DNA Profile
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0741 (HB0956)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0641 /CH0571 (SB0637/CH0570) Evidence - Admissibility of DNA Profile - Definition and Validation of DNA Profile Delegate Sophocleus 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 571
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0732 (SB0153) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0757 Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0827 /CH0124 Newborn Infant Screening - Testing by Nonpublic Laboratories - Notification Delegate O'Donnell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0956 (SB0741) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1392 Medical Laboratories - Direct-to-Consumer Genetic Testing Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0153 (HB0732) Drivers' Licenses, Identification Cards, and Moped Operators' Permits - Enhanced Identification Documents Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0637 /CH0570 (HB0641/CH0571) Evidence - Admissibility of DNA Profile - Definition and Validation of DNA Profile Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 570
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0741 (HB0956) Criminal Procedure - Expungement Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM
Click to return on the top page