Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Good Samaritan

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0649
Title
Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0924 (SB1222)
Title
Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity
Sponsor
Delegate Folden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1475
Title
Civil Actions - Duty to Render Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1730
Title
Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death
Sponsor
Delegate Impallaria
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0799)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1222 (HB0924)
Title
Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0649 Criminal Law - Opioids - Distribution Causing Death of Minor Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0924 (SB1222) Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity Delegate Folden 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/7 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Health and Government Operations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB1475 Civil Actions - Duty to Render Assistance Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1730 Criminal Law - Distribution of Heroin or Fentanyl Resulting in Death Delegate Impallaria 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0625 (HB0799) Criminal Procedure - Medical Emergency - Immunity Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1222 (HB0924) Emergency Medical Care - Administration of Opioid Antidotes - Immunity Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page