Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Hagerstown

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0478 (SB0504)
Title
Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1509 (SB0976)
Title
Collective Bargaining - Local Government Employees and Public Employee Relations Act
Sponsor
Delegate Harris
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504 (HB0478)
Title
Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc.
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0596 (HB0750)
Title
Property Tax Exemption and Payment in Lieu of Taxes - The Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc.
Sponsor
Washington County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0976 (HB1509)
Title
Collective Bargaining - Local Government Employees and Public Employee Relations Act
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0478 (SB0504) Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction Washington County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1509 (SB0976) Collective Bargaining - Local Government Employees and Public Employee Relations Act Delegate Harris 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 2:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/26/2025 - 2:30 PM
SB0504 (HB0478) Hagerstown Community College Police Force - Jurisdiction Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
SB0579 Local Government Tort Claims Act - Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc. Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
SB0596 (HB0750) Property Tax Exemption and Payment in Lieu of Taxes - The Hagerstown Multi-Use Sports and Events Facility, Inc. Washington County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/26/2025 - 2:15 PM
SB0976 (HB1509) Collective Bargaining - Local Government Employees and Public Employee Relations Act Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2025 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/11/2025 5:03 PM
Click to return on the top page