Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Harassment -see also- Threats

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 (SB0429)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 /CH0148 (SB0328/CH0149)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 (SB0530)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0495 (SB0519)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Education – Interscholastic and Intramural Teams and Sports – Designation Based on Biological Sex (Save Women’s Sports Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1225
Title
Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1356
Title
Public Schools - Reporting of Sexual Misconduct, Stalking, and Harassment (Report Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1393 (SB0450)
Title
Harassment and Sexual Harassment - Definitions - Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0162)
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 /CH0383
Title
Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Electronic Stalking
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 (HB1410)
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0254
Title
College of Southern Maryland - Vice President of Equity and Inclusion - Funding and Responsibilities
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0309
Title
Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0328 /CH0149 (HB0148/CH0148)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0375
Title
Crimes - Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications - Exception for Imminent Danger
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382
Title
Intercepted Communications - Admissibility of Evidence
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0110)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0450 (HB1393)
Title
Harassment and Sexual Harassment - Definitions - Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0519 (HB0495)
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0431)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0110 (SB0429) Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0148 /CH0148 (SB0328/CH0149) Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 148
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0431 (SB0530) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0495 (SB0519) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0757 Education – Interscholastic and Intramural Teams and Sports – Designation Based on Biological Sex (Save Women’s Sports Act) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1225 Education – Harford County Public Library – Collective Bargaining Delegate Johnson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1356 Public Schools - Reporting of Sexual Misconduct, Stalking, and Harassment (Report Act of 2022) Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1393 (SB0450) Harassment and Sexual Harassment - Definitions - Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1410 (SB0162) Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0134 /CH0383 Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Training Requirements - Electronic Stalking Senator Lee 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 383
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0162 (HB1410) Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0254 College of Southern Maryland - Vice President of Equity and Inclusion - Funding and Responsibilities Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0309 Baltimore City - Civilian Review Board - Police Accountability Board Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0328 /CH0149 (HB0148/CH0148) Criminal Law - Stalking - Definition Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 149
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0375 Crimes - Interception of Wire, Oral, or Electronic Communications - Exception for Imminent Danger Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 Intercepted Communications - Admissibility of Evidence Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0429 (HB0110) Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0450 (HB1393) Harassment and Sexual Harassment - Definitions - Employment Discrimination and Sexual Harassment Prevention Training Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0519 (HB0495) Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0431) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2022 3:20 PM
Click to return on the top page