Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Health Benefit Exchange

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0470 (SB0522)
Title
Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0534
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 /CH0150 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0780 /CH0777 (SB0729/CH0778)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002 /CH0049
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736)
Title
Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0493 (HB0589/CH0150)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0522 (HB0470)
Title
Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 /CH0778 (HB0780/CH0777)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0893 /CH0065
Title
Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0470 (SB0522) Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0534 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0581 /CH0736 (SB0486) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 736
Economic Matters
2/05/2021 - 11:00 AM
Appropriations
Finance
4/09/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB0589 /CH0150 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 150
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0780 /CH0777 (SB0729/CH0778) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program Delegate Kerr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 777
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1002 /CH0049 Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 49
Economic Matters
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0581/CH0736) Labor and Employment - Employment Standards During an Emergency (Maryland Essential Workers' Protection Act) Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0493 (HB0589/CH0150) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0522 (HB0470) Public Health - Commission on Universal Health Care Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0729 /CH0778 (HB0780/CH0777) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 778
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0893 /CH0065 Unemployment - Insurance Revisions and Special Enrollment Period for Health Benefits Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 65
Finance
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:53 AM
Click to return on the top page