Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health Care Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0014 (SB0048)
Title
Health – Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0213
Title
Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0353 (SB0253)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Landis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0378 /CH0301
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Palliative Care Services – Workgroup
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0636 (SB0531)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Assisted Living Programs - Study
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Study on Expansion of Interstate Telehealth
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Audit
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0915 (SB0591)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – Patient Safety Center – Designation and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312)
Title
Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1192
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Studies of Issues Affecting Individuals With Sickle Cell Disease
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467 (SB0994)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0048 (HB0014)
Title
Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0353)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0531 (HB0636)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Assisted Living Programs - Study
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 (HB0915)
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Patient Safety Center - Designation and Fund
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0677
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311)
Title
Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 (HB1467)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0014 (SB0048) Health – Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB0213 Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0353 (SB0253) Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments Delegate Landis 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0378 /CH0301 Maryland Health Care Commission – Palliative Care Services – Workgroup Delegate Kerr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 301
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0636 (SB0531) Maryland Health Care Commission - Assisted Living Programs - Study Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0670 Maryland Health Care Commission - Study on Expansion of Interstate Telehealth Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0747 Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Audit Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0915 (SB0591) Maryland Health Care Commission – Patient Safety Center – Designation and Fund Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Finance
HB1073 /CH0311 (SB0824/CH0312) Health - Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Delegate Cullison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1192 Maryland Health Care Commission - Studies of Issues Affecting Individuals With Sickle Cell Disease Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1467 (SB0994) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0048 (HB0014) Health - Advance Care Planning and Advance Directives Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Finance
SB0253 (HB0353) Maryland Health Care Commission – User Fee Assessments Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0531 (HB0636) Maryland Health Care Commission - Assisted Living Programs - Study Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0591 (HB0915) Maryland Health Care Commission - Patient Safety Center - Designation and Fund Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0677 Maryland Health Care Commission - Nursing Homes - Reporting Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:30 p.m.
Finance
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0824 /CH0312 (HB1073/CH0311) Health – Accessibility of Electronic Advance Care Planning Documents Senator Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 312
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0994 (HB1467) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 12:06 PM
Click to return on the top page