Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Health and Higher Educational Facilities Authority

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0471 /CH0344 (SB0447)
Title
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0938 (SB0975)
Title
Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101
Title
Health - Mifepristone - Administration
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0447 (HB0471/CH0344)
Title
Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0975 (HB0938)
Title
Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0471 /CH0344 (SB0447) Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions Delegate Young, K. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 344
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0938 (SB0975) Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1101 Health - Mifepristone - Administration Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0447 (HB0471/CH0344) Health Occupations - Requirements for the Practice of Optometry - Miscellaneous Revisions Senator Pinsky 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0975 (HB0938) Behavioral Health Transformation Act of 2019 Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:26 PM
Click to return on the top page