Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0510 /CH0696 (SB0917/CH0697)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0694 /CH0683 (SB0944)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB0840)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1127 /CH0296 (SB0984)
Title
Public Health - State Designated Exchange - Health Data Utility
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0734 /CH0667
Title
Maryland Health Care Commission - Primary Care Report and Workgroup
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1084)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0917 /CH0697 (HB0510/CH0696)
Title
Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0944 (HB0694/CH0683)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0510 /CH0696 (SB0917/CH0697) Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 696
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0694 /CH0683 (SB0944) Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 683
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1084 (SB0840) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1127 /CH0296 (SB0984) Public Health - State Designated Exchange - Health Data Utility Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Finance
SB0734 /CH0667 Maryland Health Care Commission - Primary Care Report and Workgroup Senator Lam 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 667
Finance
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0840 (HB1084) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0917 /CH0697 (HB0510/CH0696) Health Care Facilities - Health Services Cost Review Commission - User Fee Assessment Senator Augustine 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 697
Finance
3/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0944 (HB0694/CH0683) Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 7/2/2022 4:28 PM
Click to return on the top page