Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health Services Cost Review Commission

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0025
Title
Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333 (SB0404)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement Process
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 (SB0234)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Hospital Rates - All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0234 (HB0420)
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Hospital Rates - All-Payer Model Contract
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0404 (HB0333)
Title
Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement Process
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0626
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Members - Appointment
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0025 Public Health - Healthy Maryland Program - Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 6:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2023 - 6:00 PM
HB0333 (SB0404) Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement Process Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0420 (SB0234) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Hospital Rates - All-Payer Model Contract Delegate Morgan, M. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Health and Government Operations
2/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0234 (HB0420) Health Services Cost Review Commission - Hospital Rates - All-Payer Model Contract Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/02/2023 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/21/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0404 (HB0333) Hospitals - Financial Assistance - Medical Bill Reimbursement Process Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2023 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
SB0626 Health Services Cost Review Commission - Members - Appointment Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Executive Nominations
Health and Government Operations
3/28/2023 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/27/2023 11:22 AM
Click to return on the top page