Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Heating and Cooling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352
Title
State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Civil Penalties - Citation Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 (SB0201)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 - Baltimore City - Roland Park Fire Station Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0997 (SB0867)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065 (SB1014)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching Center
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1134
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of the Heat Island Effect on Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Public Utilities - Geothermal Heating and Cooling On-Bill Financing - Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0201 (HB0406)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 - Baltimore City - Roland Park Fire Station Rehabilitation
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625
Title
Real Property - Dwellings Rented to Individuals at Least 55 Years Old - Air-Conditioning Systems
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0867 (HB0997)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875
Title
Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1014 (HB1065)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching Center
Sponsor
Senator Currie
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0352 State Board of Heating, Ventilation, Air-Conditioning, and Refrigeration Contractors - Civil Penalties - Citation Authority Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0406 (SB0201) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 - Baltimore City - Roland Park Fire Station Rehabilitation Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0997 (SB0867) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB1065 (SB1014) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching Center Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1134 Task Force to Study the Impact of the Heat Island Effect on Maryland Delegate Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1428 Public Utilities - Geothermal Heating and Cooling On-Bill Financing - Pilot Program Delegate Hucker 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0201 (HB0406) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2009 - Baltimore City - Roland Park Fire Station Rehabilitation Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/27/2013 - 2:00 PM
SB0625 Real Property - Dwellings Rented to Individuals at Least 55 Years Old - Air-Conditioning Systems Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0867 (HB0997) Creation of a State Debt - Charles County - Melwood Recreation Center Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0875 Maryland Oil Disaster Containment, Clean-Up and Contingency Fund and Oil Contaminated Site Environmental Cleanup Fund Senator Conway 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1014 (HB1065) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Olde Mill Community and Teaching Center Senator Currie 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 3:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:35 PM
Click to return on the top page