Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

State Highway Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703
Title
Transportation - I-270 and I-495 - Prohibition on Adding New Lanes
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0964
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driving in Right–Hand Lanes – Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1082 (SB0863)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1297
Title
State Highways – Designations – Thurgood Marshall Highway
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0026
Title
State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0179
Title
Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0213
Title
State Highways – Designations – President Barack Obama Highway
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297
Title
Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate Highways
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387
Title
Intersection of State and Local Highways – Crosswalks and Curb Ramps
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0863 (HB1082)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0487 Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0703 Transportation - I-270 and I-495 - Prohibition on Adding New Lanes Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
HB0964 Vehicle Laws – Driving in Right–Hand Lanes – Interstate Highways in Rural Areas Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 4/12 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/09/2021 - 11:30 AM
HB1082 (SB0863) Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
HB1147 Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund – Establishment Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1297 State Highways – Designations – Thurgood Marshall Highway Delegate Walker 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0026 State Highway Administration - State Highways and Interstate Highways - Litter Collection and Mowing Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0179 Distracted Driving Monitoring Systems - Authorization Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0213 State Highways – Designations – President Barack Obama Highway Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0297 Vehicle Laws - Speed Restrictions - Expressways and Interstate Highways Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0387 Intersection of State and Local Highways – Crosswalks and Curb Ramps Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0863 (HB1082) Vehicle Laws – Enforcement and Use of Real–Time Digital Spotters Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 5:07 PM
Click to return on the top page