Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Holidays and Special Dates

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0227 /CH0064
Title
State Government - Legal and Employee Holiday - Juneteenth National Independence Day
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0319 (SB0100)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Overdose Awareness
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0479 /CH0068 (SB0005/CH0067)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0484 (SB0470)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day
Sponsor
Delegate Bhandari
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0548
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Montford Point Marines Commemoration Day
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0565
Title
Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0834
Title
On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Outreach and Education (Septic Awareness Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0005
Title
Remembrance of the Attack on Pearl Harbor
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005 /CH0067 (HB0479/CH0068)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0100 (HB0319)
Title
General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Overdose Awareness
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0470 (HB0484)
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Dashain Day
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0001
Title
Apraxia Awareness Day
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0227 /CH0064 State Government - Legal and Employee Holiday - Juneteenth National Independence Day Delegate Harrison 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 64
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0319 (SB0100) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Overdose Awareness Delegate Jones, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0479 /CH0068 (SB0005/CH0067) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day Delegate Fennell 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 68
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0484 (SB0470) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Dashain Day Delegate Bhandari 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0548 General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Montford Point Marines Commemoration Day Delegate Patterson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0565 Indigenous Peoples' Day - Rule of Interpretation and Replacement of Columbus Day Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/15/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0834 On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Outreach and Education (Septic Awareness Act of 2022) Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HJ0005 Remembrance of the Attack on Pearl Harbor Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 8:00 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/03/2022 - 8:00 AM
SB0005 /CH0067 (HB0479/CH0068) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Tuskegee Airmen Commemoration Day Senator Patterson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0100 (HB0319) General Provisions – Commemorative Days – Overdose Awareness Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0470 (HB0484) General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Dashain Day Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SJ0001 Apraxia Awareness Day Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:51 PM
Click to return on the top page