Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Home Care Services -see also- Respite Care

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0276 (SB0513)
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0407 (SB0407)
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0544 (SB0600)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 (SB0166)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972 (SB0804)
Title
Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0978
Title
Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1020 (SB0868)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, K.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 (SB0527/CH0437)
Title
Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB0840)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1252 (SB0972)
Title
Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0010
Title
Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 (HB0765)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0407 (HB0407)
Title
Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0276)
Title
Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 /CH0437 (HB1051)
Title
Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0600 (HB0544)
Title
Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0660
Title
Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0804 (HB0972)
Title
Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1084)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1020)
Title
Developmental Disabilities Administration – Self–Directed Services (Self–Direction Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0972 (HB1252)
Title
Physicians and Allied Health Professions – Reorganization and Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0276 (SB0513) Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0407 (SB0407) Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0544 (SB0600) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0765 (SB0166) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0972 (SB0804) Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0978 Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1020 (SB0868) Developmental Disabilities Administration - Self-Directed Services (Self-Direction Act of 2022) Delegate Young, K. 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Finance
HB1051 (SB0527/CH0437) Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1084 (SB0840) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1252 (SB0972) Physicians and Allied Health Professions - Reorganization and Revisions Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0010 Workers' Compensation - COVID-19 Occupational Disease Presumption Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 (HB0765) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0407 (HB0407) Health Occupations - Health Care Staffing Shortage Emergency - Declaration and Licensing and Practice Requirements (Health Care Heroes Act of 2022) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0513 (HB0276) Health Occupations - Clinical Nurse Specialists - Prescribing Authority Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0527 /CH0437 (HB1051) Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0600 (HB0544) Health Facilities - Residential Service Agencies - Reporting Requirement Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0660 Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0804 (HB0972) Continuing Care at Home - Certificate of Need - Exemption Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0840 (HB1084) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0868 (HB1020) Developmental Disabilities Administration – Self–Directed Services (Self–Direction Act of 2022) Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0972 (HB1252) Physicians and Allied Health Professions – Reorganization and Revisions Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page