Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Home Detention

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0316 (SB0023)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1331 (SB0898)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0023 (HB0316)
Title
Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898 (HB1331)
Title
Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0316 (SB0023) Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1331 (SB0898) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0023 (HB0316) Conditions of Pretrial Release - Home Detention Monitoring Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0898 (HB1331) Maryland Criminal Justice Debt Elimination and Prevention Act of 2021 Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/13/2021 1:06 PM
Click to return on the top page