Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Home Improvement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0006 /CH0211
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431
Title
Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Hogan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0453 /CH0229
Title
Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act
Sponsor
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0006 /CH0211 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Guaranty Fund - Claims Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Economic Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 Income Tax Subtraction Modification - Lead Hazard Reduction Projects Delegate Hogan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
2/14/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
HB0453 /CH0229 Housing and Community Development - Multifamily Rental Housing Programs Efficiency Act Chair, Environmental Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Environmental Matters
2/06/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page