Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Home Improvement

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Revitalization Districts
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0115 /CH0100 (SB0183/CH0056)
Title
Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248 /CH0255
Title
Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Special Fund and Fees
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0644 (SB0180/CH0229)
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0959 /CH0094 (SB0929/CH0093)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1058
Title
Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts
Sponsor
Delegate Miller, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1323 /CH0241
Title
Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180 /CH0229 (HB0644)
Title
Independent Living Tax Credit Act
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0183 /CH0056 (HB0115/CH0100)
Title
Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0929 /CH0093 (HB0959/CH0094)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0114 Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Revitalization Districts Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/07/2017 - 1:30 PM
HB0115 /CH0100 (SB0183/CH0056) Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 100
Economic Matters
1/25/2017 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0248 /CH0255 Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Special Fund and Fees Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Economic Matters
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0644 (SB0180/CH0229) Independent Living Tax Credit Act Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Ways and Means
2/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0959 /CH0094 (SB0929/CH0093) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales Delegate Kramer 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Economic Matters
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1058 Business Regulation - Home Improvement Contracts Delegate Miller, W. 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1323 /CH0241 Property Tax - Credit for Revitalization Districts Delegate Long 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Ways and Means
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0180 /CH0229 (HB0644) Independent Living Tax Credit Act Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Budget and Taxation
2/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0183 /CH0056 (HB0115/CH0100) Mold Remediation Services Providers - Licensure and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 56
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0929 /CH0093 (HB0959/CH0094) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Door-to-Door Sales Senator Astle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 93
Finance
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page