Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Homeowners Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0041
Title
Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0951
Title
Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Exemptions - Landlords
Sponsor
Delegate Glenn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1007
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0762
Title
Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0041 Immunities - Associations, Organizations, and Charities - Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0951 Maryland Collection Agency Licensing Act - Exemptions - Landlords Delegate Glenn 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1007 Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Disclosures to Purchasers on Resale of Unit or Lot - Limitation on Fees Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0762 Real Property - Installation and Use of Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page