Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Homeowners Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0055
Title
Immunities – Associations, Organizations, and Charities – Liability of Agents and Volunteers
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 (SB0144)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0160
Title
Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0248
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Rights and Restrictions - Composting
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0313
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361
Title
Real Property - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516
Title
Bicounty Agencies – Prince George’s County – Use and Occupancy Permits – Notice Requirements MC/PG 107-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0567
Title
Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0593 (SB0535)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0623
Title
Prince George's County - Assisted Living Program Licensing - Notice of Applicant Located in Common Ownership Community PG 401-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0826
Title
Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 (SB0686)
Title
Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0144 (HB0110)
Title
Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535 (HB0593)
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 (HB1023)
Title
Real Property - Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations - Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0055 Immunities – Associations, Organizations, and Charities – Liability of Agents and Volunteers Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/15 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0110 (SB0144) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0160 Environment – Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0248 Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Rights and Restrictions - Composting Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0313 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0361 Real Property - Governing Bodies of Common Ownership Communities - Member Training Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0516 Bicounty Agencies – Prince George’s County – Use and Occupancy Permits – Notice Requirements MC/PG 107-21 Montgomery County Delegation and Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0567 Montgomery County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies MC 3-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0593 (SB0535) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0623 Prince George's County - Assisted Living Program Licensing - Notice of Applicant Located in Common Ownership Community PG 401-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0826 Real Property – Condominiums and Homeowners Associations – Dispute Settlement Delegate Healey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 (SB0686) Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0144 (HB0110) Electric Vehicle Recharging Equipment for Multifamily Units Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2021 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0535 (HB0593) Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Meeting Requirements Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0686 (HB1023) Real Property - Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations - Virtual Meetings Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 2:28 PM
Click to return on the top page