Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Homeowners Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0071
Title
Manufactured Homes - Sale of Manufactured Housing Communities (Manufactured Housing Modernization Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0093
Title
Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0107 /CH0664
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0140
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149
Title
Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Voluntary Registry and Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 (SB0145)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Property Insurance Deductibles - Member Responsibility
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401
Title
Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0615 /CH0282
Title
Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060
Title
Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1061
Title
Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1147
Title
Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1259 (SB0871)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0145 (HB0197)
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations – Property Insurance Deductibles – Member Responsibility
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0871 (HB1259)
Title
Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Real Property - Regulation of Common Ownership Community Managers Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0071 Manufactured Homes - Sale of Manufactured Housing Communities (Manufactured Housing Modernization Act) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0093 Candidates for Offices of Municipalities and Common Ownership Communities - Reports of Donations and Disbursements Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0107 /CH0664 Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies - Statewide Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 664
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0140 Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Governing Bodies and Annual Meetings Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0149 Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Voluntary Registry and Notice Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0197 (SB0145) Cooperative Housing Corporations - Property Insurance Deductibles - Member Responsibility Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0401 Prince George's County - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies PG 403-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0615 /CH0282 Real Property - Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Dispute Settlement Delegate Healey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 282
Environment and Transportation
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1060 Residential Owners in Common Ownership Communities Bill of Rights Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1061 Local Government - Condominium and Homeowners Associations - Repair and Rehabilitation Funds Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1147 Real Property - Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Virtual Meetings Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1259 (SB0871) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
SB0145 (HB0197) Cooperative Housing Corporations – Property Insurance Deductibles – Member Responsibility Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 2:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0871 (HB1259) Accessory Dwelling Unit Authorization and Promotion Act Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:19 PM
Click to return on the top page