Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Hotels and Motels

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0270 /CH0487 (SB0091/CH0488)
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0361 (SB0320)
Title
Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0486)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842 /CH0604
Title
Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1273
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0091 /CH0488 (HB0270/CH0487)
Title
Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0139
Title
Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0320 (HB0361)
Title
Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0572)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0622 (HB1273)
Title
Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0270 /CH0487 (SB0091/CH0488) Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 487
Economic Matters
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0361 (SB0320) Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit Delegate Henson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0572 (SB0486) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0842 /CH0604 Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1273 Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
SB0091 /CH0488 (HB0270/CH0487) Business Regulation - Innkeepers - Maintenance of Guest Records and Employee Human Trafficking Awareness Training and Policy Senator Jackson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 488
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0139 Public Health - Semipublic Pools - Lifeguards Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0320 (HB0361) Mold Inspections and Remediation - Standards, Reporting, Penalties, and Tax Credit Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0486 (HB0572) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0622 (HB1273) Income Tax - Credit for Travel, Hospitality, and Entertainment Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:16 PM
Click to return on the top page