Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Howard County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019
Title
Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Howard County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Ho. Co. 13-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865
Title
Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0868
Title
Circuit Court for Howard County – Judges Sitting as Orphans’ Court Ho. Co. 06–22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0878
Title
Howard County - Department of Housing and Community Development - Housing Opportunities Trust Fund Ho. Co. 05-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885
Title
Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1051 (SB0527/CH0437)
Title
Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103 (SB0658)
Title
Transportation – Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1212
Title
Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Residency Requirements Ho. Co. 16–22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1247 /CH0103
Title
Howard County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Ho. Co. 10-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Petition of Support Requirement Ho. Co. 15-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1308
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Notifications Ho. Co. 14-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1461
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consideration of Factors for Issuance of Licenses Ho. Co. 11-22
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0315
Title
Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0527 /CH0437 (HB1051)
Title
Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0599
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0658 (HB1103)
Title
Transportation - Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0756
Title
University System of Maryland - County School Technology Pilot Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 Education - School Construction - Pedestrian Safety Plans (Safe Walk to School Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Howard County Alcoholic Beverages Act of 2022 Ho. Co. 13-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0865 Howard County – Due Process Proceedings for Children With Disabilities – Burden of Proof Ho. Co. 02-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0868 Circuit Court for Howard County – Judges Sitting as Orphans’ Court Ho. Co. 06–22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0878 Howard County - Department of Housing and Community Development - Housing Opportunities Trust Fund Ho. Co. 05-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0885 Howard County - Sheriff - Salary Ho. Co. 03-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1051 (SB0527/CH0437) Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1103 (SB0658) Transportation – Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1212 Howard County – Alcoholic Beverages Licenses – Residency Requirements Ho. Co. 16–22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1247 /CH0103 Howard County - Property Tax - Credit for Seniors to Offset Property Tax Rate Increase Ho. Co. 10-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 103
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 Howard County - Public Schools - Alternative Instruction Model Policy Ho. Co. 09-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Repeal of Petition of Support Requirement Ho. Co. 15-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1308 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Notifications Ho. Co. 14-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1461 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Consideration of Factors for Issuance of Licenses Ho. Co. 11-22 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0496 /CH0315 Business Regulation - Miscellaneous State Business Licenses - Alterations Senator Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 315
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0527 /CH0437 (HB1051) Elderly Individuals - Howard County and Montgomery County Adult Day Health Care Services Pilot Program and Task Force Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 437
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0599 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0658 (HB1103) Transportation - Maryland Aviation Infrastructure Impacts Commission Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0756 University System of Maryland - County School Technology Pilot Program - Established Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB1009 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Budget and Taxation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2022 - 1:45 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:57 PM
Click to return on the top page