Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Financial Institutions (I1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0498
Title
Financial Institutions - Automated Teller Machine Check Deposits - Mandatory Review
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1219
Title
Consumer Protection - Required Notice by Financial Institutions - Nonpublic Personal Information
Sponsor
Delegate Cullison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1306
Title
Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Gutierrez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1322
Title
Transportation Infrastructure Bank
Sponsor
Delegate Clagett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1463
Title
Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Disclosure of Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0003
Title
Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0498 Financial Institutions - Automated Teller Machine Check Deposits - Mandatory Review Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1219 Consumer Protection - Required Notice by Financial Institutions - Nonpublic Personal Information Delegate Cullison 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1306 Public Banking Institutions - Authorization and Task Force Delegate Gutierrez 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1322 Transportation Infrastructure Bank Delegate Clagett 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1368 Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Regulation of Mortgage Lenders, Mortgage Loan Originators, and Money Transmitters - Revisions Chair, Economic Matters Committee 5 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1463 Financial Institutions - Check Cashing Services - Disclosure of Fees Delegate Frick 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HJ0003 Reinstatement of the Separation of Commercial and Investment Banking Functions Delegate Braveboy 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/04/2013 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:27 PM
Click to return on the top page