Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection (I3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0026
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 (SB0412)
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0106
Title
Consumer Protection - Robocalls and Spam Calls - Website to Report and Annual Report
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0117 (SB0217)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0148 (SB0112)
Title
Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218 (SB0016)
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0340
Title
Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 (SB0507)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0585
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Financial Capabilities and Legal Assistance Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0642
Title
Consumer Protection – Maryland Consumer Reporting Act – Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657 (SB0255)
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0664 (SB0532)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0747
Title
Consumer Protection - Internet Event Ticket Sales - Prohibition on Sharing Personal Information
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1064
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2021
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Maryland Judiciary - Personal Identifying Information - Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235
Title
Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Entertainment Events and Ticketing Practices
Sponsor
Delegate Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Retail Pricing – Required Disclosure and Manner of Disclosure
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0016 (HB0218)
Title
Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 (HB0148)
Title
Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0217 (HB0117)
Title
Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0238
Title
Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0255 (HB0657)
Title
Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0412 (HB0084)
Title
Consumer Protection - Right to Repair
Sponsor
Senator Hester
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 (HB0554)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0532 (HB0664)
Title
Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0930
Title
Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0026 Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0084 (SB0412) Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0106 Consumer Protection - Robocalls and Spam Calls - Website to Report and Annual Report Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0117 (SB0217) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0148 (SB0112) Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Delegate Carey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0218 (SB0016) Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0340 Commercial Law – Retail Transactions – Cash Payments (Cash Transactions Preservation Act) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0554 (SB0507) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2021 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0585 Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Financial Capabilities and Legal Assistance Fund Delegate Davis, D.M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0642 Consumer Protection – Maryland Consumer Reporting Act – Regulations Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0657 (SB0255) Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0664 (SB0532) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0747 Consumer Protection - Internet Event Ticket Sales - Prohibition on Sharing Personal Information Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1064 Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2021 Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1184 Maryland Judiciary - Personal Identifying Information - Protection Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1235 Commercial Law – Consumer Protection – Entertainment Events and Ticketing Practices Delegate Brooks 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1274 Retail Pricing – Required Disclosure and Manner of Disclosure Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0016 (HB0218) Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 (HB0148) Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0217 (HB0117) Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Revisions Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0238 Consumer Protection - Banking Institutions - Unauthorized Debit Transactions (Consumer Bank Deposits Protection Act) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0255 (HB0657) Commercial Law – Maryland Credit Services Business Act – Revisions Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0412 (HB0084) Consumer Protection - Right to Repair Senator Hester 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0507 (HB0554) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Senator Kelley 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0532 (HB0664) Financial Institutions - Consumer Credit - Sales-Based Financing Transactions Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0930 Maryland Online Consumer Protection Act Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/9/2021 12:40 PM
Click to return on the top page