Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Immigrants and Citizenship -see also- Residency

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 (SB0078)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0114 (SB0129)
Title
Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0431 (SB0530)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Delegate Foley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 (SB0523)
Title
Occupations and Professions - Licenses, Certificates, and Registration - Immigrants
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0756
Title
Correctional Services - Transfers to Federal Authorities - Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders From Violent Crime Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Szeliga
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0928 (SB0875)
Title
Discrimination in Housing - Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1080 /CH0028 (SB0778)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Children and Pregnant Women (Healthy Babies Equity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1457
Title
Real Estate Transactions - Prospective Buyer Communications - Personal Information
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0078 (HB0072)
Title
Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act)
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 (HB0114)
Title
Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0523 (HB0533)
Title
Health Occupations - Licenses, Certificates, and Registration - Immigrants
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0530 (HB0431)
Title
Maryland Fair Scheduling Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0692
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act)
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0778 (HB1080/CH0028)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Children and Pregnant Women (Healthy Babies Equity Act)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 (HB0928)
Title
Discrimination in Housing – Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0072 (SB0078) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law – Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0114 (SB0129) Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0431 (SB0530) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Delegate Foley 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 (SB0523) Occupations and Professions - Licenses, Certificates, and Registration - Immigrants Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0756 Correctional Services - Transfers to Federal Authorities - Undocumented Immigrants (Protecting Marylanders From Violent Crime Act of 2022) Delegate Szeliga 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0928 (SB0875) Discrimination in Housing - Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1080 /CH0028 (SB0778) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Children and Pregnant Women (Healthy Babies Equity Act) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 28
Health and Government Operations
3/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1163 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1457 Real Estate Transactions - Prospective Buyer Communications - Personal Information Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0011 Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0078 (HB0072) Maryland Wage and Hour Law and Maryland Wage Payment and Collection Law - Revisions (Maryland Wage Protection Act) Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0129 (HB0114) Access to Counsel in Immigration Proceedings Program Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0523 (HB0533) Health Occupations - Licenses, Certificates, and Registration - Immigrants Senator Kagan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2022 - 12:00 PM
SB0530 (HB0431) Maryland Fair Scheduling Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0692 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation (Cannabis Legalization and Reparations for the War on Drugs Act) Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0778 (HB1080/CH0028) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Children and Pregnant Women (Healthy Babies Equity Act) Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0875 (HB0928) Discrimination in Housing – Citizenship, Immigration Status, and National Origin Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/24/2022 4:26 PM
Click to return on the top page