Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Immunization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179 /CH0256 (SB0401/CH0255)
Title
Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations - Expanded Authority and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Hubbard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0922
Title
Public Health - Feral Cats - Rabies Vaccinations
Sponsor
Delegate Kach
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0401 /CH0255 (HB0179/CH0256)
Title
Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations - Expanded Authority and Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Dyson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0179 /CH0256 (SB0401/CH0255) Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations - Expanded Authority and Reporting Requirements Delegate Hubbard 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Health and Government Operations
1/31/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0922 Public Health - Feral Cats - Rabies Vaccinations Delegate Kach 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0401 /CH0255 (HB0179/CH0256) Pharmacists - Administration of Vaccinations - Expanded Authority and Reporting Requirements Senator Dyson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 255
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/04/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:36 PM
Click to return on the top page