Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Immunization

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0286 /CH0404
Title
Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0618
Title
Maryland Parental Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0779
Title
Vaccination Requirements – Provision of Services – Statement of Prior Viral Infection
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0799
Title
State and Local Government - COVID-19 - Vaccination by Choice Act
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0819 (SB0943)
Title
Public Health - COVID-19 and Other Influenza-Like Illnesses - Antibody Tests
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901
Title
Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0953
Title
Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB0840)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1189
Title
Public Health - Vaccines Administered Under Emergency Use Authorization - Reporting of Adverse Events
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1291
Title
Public Schools - Student Immunization Requirements - Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1292
Title
Public Schools and Child Care Providers - Immunizations - Discriminatory Policies Prohibited
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1347
Title
Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1376
Title
Labor and Employment - COVID-19 Vaccinations - Exemption Process (No Jabs for Jobs)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1378
Title
Public Health – COVID–19 – Antibody Tests (COVID–19 Natural Immunity Parity Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0168 /CH0220
Title
Department of Health - ImmuNet and Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0839
Title
Maryland Voluntary COVID-19 Vaccine Passport
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0840 (HB1084)
Title
COVID-19 Response Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0857
Title
Hospital Flu Vaccines
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0943 (HB0819)
Title
Public Health – COVID–19 and Other Influenza–Like Illnesses – Antibody Tests
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SS0001
Title
Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID-19
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0286 /CH0404 Emergency Medical Services - Paramedics - Immunization Administration - Effective Date Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 404
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0618 Maryland Parental Rights Act Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0779 Vaccination Requirements – Provision of Services – Statement of Prior Viral Infection Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0799 State and Local Government - COVID-19 - Vaccination by Choice Act Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0819 (SB0943) Public Health - COVID-19 and Other Influenza-Like Illnesses - Antibody Tests Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0901 Unemployment Insurance - Disqualification Exceptions - COVID-19 Vaccination Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0953 Parent and Guardian Rights - Education, Health, and Upbringing of Children Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 12:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/25/2022 - 12:30 PM
HB1084 (SB0840) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1189 Public Health - Vaccines Administered Under Emergency Use Authorization - Reporting of Adverse Events Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1291 Public Schools - Student Immunization Requirements - Authority Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1292 Public Schools and Child Care Providers - Immunizations - Discriminatory Policies Prohibited Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB1347 Authority of the Secretary of Health and Medical Information Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1376 Labor and Employment - COVID-19 Vaccinations - Exemption Process (No Jabs for Jobs) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1378 Public Health – COVID–19 – Antibody Tests (COVID–19 Natural Immunity Parity Act) Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/14/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0168 /CH0220 Department of Health - ImmuNet and Statewide Advisory Commission on Immunizations Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 220
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0839 Maryland Voluntary COVID-19 Vaccine Passport Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0840 (HB1084) COVID-19 Response Act of 2022 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0857 Hospital Flu Vaccines Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0943 (HB0819) Public Health – COVID–19 and Other Influenza–Like Illnesses – Antibody Tests Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SS0001 Implementation of Modified Procedures Due to COVID-19 President 6 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 2:45 PM
Click to return on the top page