Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Insects -see also- Bees

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0400 /CH0296
Title
Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities
Sponsor
Delegate Tarlau
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0705
Title
Environment – Graywater – Residential Use
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0400 /CH0296 Agriculture - Mosquito Control - Notification to Municipalities Delegate Tarlau 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 296
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0496 /CH0705 Environment – Graywater – Residential Use Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 705
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page