Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Insurance Administration

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0078 (SB0052)
Title
Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0441 /CH0089 (SB0366/CH0088)
Title
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589 (SB0493)
Title
Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0601 (SB0964)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0603
Title
Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Explanation of Benefits Statements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0709 (SB0614)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Drug Reimbursement - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0780 (SB0729)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0919 (SB0638)
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims - Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1251 (SB0805)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070)
Title
Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Griffith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0052 (HB0078)
Title
Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0069 (HB0879)
Title
Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0120 /CH0104
Title
Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0226 /CH0105
Title
Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0272
Title
Insurance - Claim Payment - Clarification
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 /CH0088 (HB0441/CH0089)
Title
Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0372
Title
Civil Action - Surety Insurance - Failure to Act in Good Faith
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0614 (HB0709)
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Drug Reimbursement - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0638 (HB0919)
Title
Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims - Enforcement
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 (HB0780)
Title
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0805 (HB1251)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0892
Title
Real Property – Residential Leases – Fee in Lieu of Security Deposit
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0078 (SB0052) Public Health - Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan-Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0441 /CH0089 (SB0366/CH0088) Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force Delegate McKay 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 89
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0589 (SB0493) Budget Reconciliation and Financing Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0601 (SB0964) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Revisions Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0603 Health Insurance - Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Explanation of Benefits Statements Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0709 (SB0614) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Drug Reimbursement - Reporting Requirements Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0780 (SB0729) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0919 (SB0638) Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims - Enforcement Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB1251 (SB0805) Motor Vehicle Insurance – Rate Filings – Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0003 /CH0071 (HB0123/CH0070) Preserve Telehealth Access Act of 2021 Senator Griffith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 71
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0052 (HB0078) Public Health – Maryland Commission on Health Equity (The Shirley Nathan–Pulliam Health Equity Act of 2021) Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
Health and Government Operations
SB0069 (HB0879) Cybersecurity Coordination and Operations - Establishment and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2021 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0120 /CH0104 Insurance - Credit for Reinsurance Model Law - Revisions Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0226 /CH0105 Maryland Insurance Administration - Delivery of Notices and Other Communications by Electronic Means Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 105
Finance
1/14/2021 - 11:00 AM
Economic Matters
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0272 Insurance - Claim Payment - Clarification Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/19/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0366 /CH0088 (HB0441/CH0089) Department of Assessments and Taxation - Identification Number for Business - Task Force Senator McCray 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0372 Civil Action - Surety Insurance - Failure to Act in Good Faith Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0614 (HB0709) Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Drug Reimbursement - Reporting Requirements Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0638 (HB0919) Maryland Insurance Commissioner - Specialty Mental Health Services and Payment of Claims - Enforcement Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0729 (HB0780) Maryland Health Benefit Exchange – State–Based Young Adult Health Insurance Subsidies Pilot Program Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0805 (HB1251) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Rate Filings - Discrimination, Trade Secrets, and States of Emergency Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0892 Real Property – Residential Leases – Fee in Lieu of Security Deposit Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Referred to interim study by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 4:21 PM
Click to return on the top page