Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Interior Designers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0040 (SB0386)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0442 (SB0323)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1084 (SB0581)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0323 (HB0442)
Title
Mechanics' Liens - Design Services
Sponsor
Senator Bates
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0386 (HB0040)
Title
Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 (HB1084)
Title
Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence Commission
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0040 (SB0386) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0442 (SB0323) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Delegate Holmes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB1084 (SB0581) Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence Commission Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0323 (HB0442) Mechanics' Liens - Design Services Senator Bates 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
SB0386 (HB0040) Courts - Certificate of Merit - Provider of Professional Services Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 (HB1084) Business and Economic Development - Maryland Design Excellence Commission Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:37 PM
Click to return on the top page