Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Health Maintenance Organizations (J4)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675 (SB0621)
Title
Health Insurance – Changes to Coverage, Benefits, and Drug Formularies – Timing
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0937 /CH0056 (SB0890)
Title
Abortion Care Access Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Access to Abortion Care and Health Insurance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0974 (SB0725)
Title
Health Insurance - Physical Therapy - Copayments, Coinsurance, and Deductibles
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0180 /CH0229
Title
Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355
Title
HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0621 (HB0675)
Title
Health Insurance - Changes to Coverage, Benefits, and Drug Formularies - Timing
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688
Title
Health Insurance - Utilization Review for Coverage of Prescription Drugs and Devices - Expedited Appeals
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB0974)
Title
Health Insurance - Physical Therapy - Copayments, Coinsurance, and Deductibles
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0890 (HB0937/CH0056)
Title
Abortion Care Access Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0675 (SB0621) Health Insurance – Changes to Coverage, Benefits, and Drug Formularies – Timing Delegate Hartman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/17/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0937 /CH0056 (SB0890) Abortion Care Access Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 56
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB0952 Access to Abortion Care and Health Insurance Act Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0974 (SB0725) Health Insurance - Physical Therapy - Copayments, Coinsurance, and Deductibles Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
2/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0180 /CH0229 Insurance - Conformity With Federal Law - The No Surprises Act and Other Provisions of the Consolidated Appropriations Act, 2021 Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 229
Finance
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/31/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0355 HIV Prevention Drugs - Prescribing and Dispensing by Pharmacists and Insurance Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0621 (HB0675) Health Insurance - Changes to Coverage, Benefits, and Drug Formularies - Timing Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0688 Health Insurance - Utilization Review for Coverage of Prescription Drugs and Devices - Expedited Appeals Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 (HB0974) Health Insurance - Physical Therapy - Copayments, Coinsurance, and Deductibles Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0890 (HB0937/CH0056) Abortion Care Access Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Finance
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:32 AM
Click to return on the top page