Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0095
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0098 /CH0533 (SB0156/CH0532)
Title
Criminal Law - Participation in Court Proceedings - Retaliation
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0218
Title
Courts - Evidence of Prior Sexual Offense - Admissibility
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556
Title
Criminal Law - Threatening Juror, Witness, or Officer of Court for Performance of Duty - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0607
Title
Courts - Jurors - State Per Diem Amount
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757
Title
Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992
Title
Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122
Title
Voting Disclosure Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate McDonough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0156 /CH0532 (HB0098/CH0533)
Title
Criminal Law - Participation in Court Proceedings - Retaliation
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0157
Title
Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0235
Title
Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1101
Title
Jurors - Qualification - Prior Conviction
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0095 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0098 /CH0533 (SB0156/CH0532) Criminal Law - Participation in Court Proceedings - Retaliation Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 533
Judiciary
1/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0218 Courts - Evidence of Prior Sexual Offense - Admissibility Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0556 Criminal Law - Threatening Juror, Witness, or Officer of Court for Performance of Duty - Penalties Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0607 Courts - Jurors - State Per Diem Amount Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0757 Criminal Law - Life Without the Possibility of Parole - First Degree Murder Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0992 Health Care Malpractice Claims - Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office - Repeal Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1122 Voting Disclosure Act of 2016 Delegate McDonough 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0156 /CH0532 (HB0098/CH0533) Criminal Law - Participation in Court Proceedings - Retaliation Senator Cassilly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0157 Criminal Procedure - Life Without Parole - Repeal of Sentencing Proceeding Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2016 - 1:30 PM
SB0235 Courts - Evidence of Sexually Assaultive Behavior - Admissibility Senator Brochin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0656 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1101 Jurors - Qualification - Prior Conviction Senator Gladden 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:41 PM
Click to return on the top page