Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Juries -see also- Grand Juries

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0887
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder
Sponsor
Delegate Shoemaker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1411 (SB0346)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0005
Title
Civil Actions - Punitive Damage Awards
Sponsor
Senator Norman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0036
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0122
Title
Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346 (HB1411)
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0357
Title
Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0816
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0289 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB0887 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Murder of Specific Individuals or Mass Murder Delegate Shoemaker 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1411 (SB0346) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0005 Civil Actions - Punitive Damage Awards Senator Norman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0036 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0122 Criminal Law – Comprehensive Crime Bill of 2018 Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
1/25/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB0346 (HB1411) Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Reinstatement Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0357 Voter Registration Integrity Act of 2018 Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0816 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:47 PM
Click to return on the top page