Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Juvenile Facilities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139 /CH0733
Title
Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0003/CH0513)
Title
Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0042
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 /CH0513 (HB0297)
Title
Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0219
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Facilities - J. DeWeese Carter Center
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 /CH0733 Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 733
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0297 (SB0003/CH0513) Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB0459 /CH0042 Juvenile Justice Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0877 Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0003 /CH0513 (HB0297) Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0172 /CH0219 Department of Juvenile Services - Facilities - J. DeWeese Carter Center Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page