Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Juvenile Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0139
Title
Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146
Title
Education - Reportable Offenses, Student Discipline, and School Disruptions - Presence of an Attorney and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Juveniles - Reportable Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0003)
Title
Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0360
Title
Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0042
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0763 /CH0147 (SB0231)
Title
Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0877
Title
Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1010
Title
Children - Substance Abuse Court-Ordered Evaluations and Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1023 (SB0785)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Offense Database
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0003 (HB0297)
Title
Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0172 /CH0219
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Facilities - J. DeWeese Carter Center
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0231 (HB0763/CH0147)
Title
Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 /CH0041
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 (HB1023)
Title
Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0904
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910
Title
Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0139 Correctional Education - Juvenile Services Education Program and Correction Education Teachers Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0146 Education - Reportable Offenses, Student Discipline, and School Disruptions - Presence of an Attorney and Reporting Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Ways and Means
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0214 Juveniles - Reportable Offenses Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0297 (SB0003) Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/02/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB0360 Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0459 /CH0042 Juvenile Justice Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 42
Judiciary
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0763 /CH0147 (SB0231) Correctional Officers’ Retirement System – Membership Delegate Bridges 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 147
Appropriations
2/17/2022 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0877 Juveniles Charged as Adults - Confinement Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1010 Children - Substance Abuse Court-Ordered Evaluations and Treatment Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1023 (SB0785) Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services Speaker 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Appropriations
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1142 Department of Juvenile Services - Juvenile Offense Database Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0003 (HB0297) Facilities - Disabilities, Juveniles, Behavioral Health, and Health Care - Plans Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Finance
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0172 /CH0219 Department of Juvenile Services - Facilities - J. DeWeese Carter Center Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 219
Judicial Proceedings
1/13/2022 - 1:30 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0231 (HB0763/CH0147) Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership Senator Jackson 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2022 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
SB0691 /CH0041 Juvenile Justice Reform Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0785 (HB1023) Department of Legislative Services - Collection of Information Related to Public Safety, Criminal Justice, Corrections, and Juvenile Services President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0904 Maryland Higher Education Commission - Returning Youth Grant Program - Established Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0910 Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2022 10:26 AM
Click to return on the top page