Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Juvenile Services, Department of

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0031
Title
Juvenile Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying - Inquiry by Intake Officer
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0138
Title
Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum (Financial Literacy for All Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0161 (SB0277)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 (SB0623)
Title
Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0297 (SB0134)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0302 (SB0177)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Employees, and Court-Ordered Services Providers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity - Penalties and Registry
Sponsor
Delegate Embry
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556
Title
Juvenile Law - Violations of Electronic Monitoring - Notification
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0814 (SB0744)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833
Title
Parents in Substance Use Disorder Treatment - Children in Need of Assistance and Treatment Facilities
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0981
Title
Principal Departments - Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Access to Public Services
Sponsor
Delegate Martinez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1359
Title
Facilities - Disabilities and Juveniles - Community Relations Plans
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437
Title
Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073
Title
Department of Juvenile Services - Firearm Offenses - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0134 (HB0297)
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 (HB0302)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Employees, and Court-Ordered Services Providers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity - Penalties and Registry
Sponsor
Senator Muse
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0277 (HB0161)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 (HB0209)
Title
Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0636
Title
Juvenile Law – Commission to Study the Ability of the Department of Juvenile Services to Provide Effective Social Services to Juvenile Offenders
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0652
Title
Department of Juvenile Services – Report on Shootings (Department of Juvenile Services Transparency Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732
Title
Department of Juvenile Services and Maryland Department of Health – Inpatient Program for Children
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0814)
Title
Juvenile Law - Reform
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0031 Juvenile Law - Electronic Harassment and Bullying - Inquiry by Intake Officer Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0138 Education - Financial Literacy Curriculum (Financial Literacy for All Act) Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
HB0161 (SB0277) Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Environment and Transportation
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0209 (SB0623) Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0297 (SB0134) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Delegate Davis 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Judicial Proceedings
HB0302 (SB0177) Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Employees, and Court-Ordered Services Providers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity - Penalties and Registry Delegate Embry 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0556 Juvenile Law - Violations of Electronic Monitoring - Notification Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 12:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0814 (SB0744) Juvenile Law - Reform Speaker 6 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/08/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0833 Parents in Substance Use Disorder Treatment - Children in Need of Assistance and Treatment Facilities Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Judiciary
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0981 Principal Departments - Individuals With Limited English Proficiency - Access to Public Services Delegate Martinez 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1359 Facilities - Disabilities and Juveniles - Community Relations Plans Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Health and Government Operations
HB1437 Juvenile Law - Juvenile Crime Reform Delegate Grammer 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0073 Department of Juvenile Services - Firearm Offenses - Reporting Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0134 (HB0297) Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding Senator Hettleman 2 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
4/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0177 (HB0302) Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Employees, and Court-Ordered Services Providers - Prohibition on Sexual Activity - Penalties and Registry Senator Muse 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Judicial Proceedings
2/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0277 (HB0161) Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses, Learner's Instructional Permits, and Identification Cards Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Passed Enrolled
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 (HB0209) Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0636 Juvenile Law – Commission to Study the Ability of the Department of Juvenile Services to Provide Effective Social Services to Juvenile Offenders Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0652 Department of Juvenile Services – Report on Shootings (Department of Juvenile Services Transparency Act of 2024) Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0732 Department of Juvenile Services and Maryland Department of Health – Inpatient Program for Children Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0744 (HB0814) Juvenile Law - Reform President 6 2 In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2024 - 12:00 PM
Judiciary
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/12/2024 6:22 PM
Click to return on the top page