Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Kent County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0485 /CH0458
Title
Montgomery County - Deer Hunting - Sundays MC 25-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144 (SB0664)
Title
Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 /CH0592 (SB0729/CH0593)
Title
Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Prettyman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1465 (SB0982)
Title
Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0664 (HB1144)
Title
Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 /CH0593 (HB1362/CH0592)
Title
Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0982 (HB1465)
Title
Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0485 /CH0458 Montgomery County - Deer Hunting - Sundays MC 25-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 458
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 (SB0664) Income Tax - Film Production Activity Tax Credit - Filming Locations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1362 /CH0592 (SB0729/CH0593) Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification Delegate Prettyman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1465 (SB0982) Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0664 (HB1144) Income Tax – Film Production Activity Tax Credit – Filming Locations Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0729 /CH0593 (HB1362/CH0592) Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification Senator McCray 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0982 (HB1465) Kent County - Archery Hunting - Safety Zone Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page