Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Counties - Generally (L1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0061 (SB0081)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0231
Title
Montgomery County - Automated Traffic Enforcement - Implementing Agency MC 18-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0323
Title
Real Property - Limitations on Summoning Law Enforcement or Emergency Services - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0333
Title
Baltimore County - Sewer Service Charge - Adjustment
Sponsor
Delegate Long
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
Montgomery County Council and Prince George's County Council - Candidate Residency Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 (SB0486)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 (SB0918)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1353
Title
Omnibus Procurement Reform Act ("OPRA") of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372
Title
Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428
Title
Code Counties - Legislative Procedure - Notice Requirements
Sponsor
Charles County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1481 (SB1002)
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0081 (HB0061)
Title
Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0486 (HB0572)
Title
Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB0718)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1002 (HB1481)
Title
Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0061 (SB0081) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022) Delegate Stewart 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0231 Montgomery County - Automated Traffic Enforcement - Implementing Agency MC 18-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0323 Real Property - Limitations on Summoning Law Enforcement or Emergency Services - Prohibition Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0333 Baltimore County - Sewer Service Charge - Adjustment Delegate Long 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB0525 Montgomery County Council and Prince George's County Council - Candidate Residency Requirements Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0572 (SB0486) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0718 (SB0918) Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1353 Omnibus Procurement Reform Act ("OPRA") of 2022 Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1372 Environment - Green Infrastructure Rebate Program - Establishment Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 2:15 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2022 - 2:15 PM
HB1428 Code Counties - Legislative Procedure - Notice Requirements Charles County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1481 (SB1002) Charter and Code Home Rule Counties - County Property Leases - Notice Exemptions Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0081 (HB0061) Charter Counties - Enforcement of Local Building Performance Laws (Building Energy Performance Standards Act of 2022) Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0486 (HB0572) Places of Public Accommodation and Public Buildings - Gender-Inclusive Signage Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0918 (HB0718) Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1002 (HB1481) Charter and Code Home Rule Counties – County Property Leases – Notice Exemptions Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:54 PM
Click to return on the top page