Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Municipalities (L3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0734
Title
Municipalities - Vagrancy - Repeal of Authority to Prohibit
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0960 /CH0983 (SB1154)
Title
City of Frederick - Assignment of Offenders to Road Work - Repeal
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059
Title
Prince George's County - Qualifying Municipal Corporation - Land Use PG/MC 105-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1436
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Johnson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1154 (HB0960/CH0983)
Title
City of Frederick - Assignment of Offenders to Road Work - Repeal (Frederick City Road Gang Injustice Repeal Act)
Sponsor
Frederick County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0734 Municipalities - Vagrancy - Repeal of Authority to Prohibit Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0960 /CH0983 (SB1154) City of Frederick - Assignment of Offenders to Road Work - Repeal Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 983
Judiciary
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1059 Prince George's County - Qualifying Municipal Corporation - Land Use PG/MC 105-24 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
HB1436 Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Delegate Johnson, S. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1154 (HB0960/CH0983) City of Frederick - Assignment of Offenders to Road Work - Repeal (Frederick City Road Gang Injustice Repeal Act) Frederick County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page