Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Labeling

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1185 (SB0928)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Delegate Anderson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1239 (SB0280)
Title
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0374
Title
Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0280 (HB1239)
Title
Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 /CH0086
Title
Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0928 (HB1185)
Title
Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1185 (SB0928) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Delegate Anderson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1239 (SB0280) Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/15/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 /CH0374 Environment - Compostable, Degradable, and Biodegradable Plastic Products - Labeling Delegate Robinson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 374
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0280 (HB1239) Environment - Nonwoven Disposable Products - Advertising and Labeling Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0681 /CH0086 Consumer Protection - Recovering of Bedding - Limitation Senator Ramirez 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 86
Finance
3/01/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/22/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0928 (HB1185) Criminal Law - Cannabis - Legalization Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM
Click to return on the top page