Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Laboratories

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0084 /CH0922 (SB0332/CH0923)
Title
Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0096 /CH0177 (SB0117/CH0178)
Title
Health - Newborn Screening Program - Implementation of Testing
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0119 /CH0752 (SB0211)
Title
Public Health - Giving Infants a Future Without Transmission (GIFT) Act
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0210
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use and Electric–Ready Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0249
Title
Public Safety - Statewide DNA Database System, DNA Collection, and Penalties - Alterations
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1168 /CH0600 (SB1028/CH0599)
Title
Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1279 (SB1023)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric- and Solar-Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0117 /CH0178 (HB0096/CH0177)
Title
Health - Newborn Screening Program - Implementation of Testing
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0211 (HB0119/CH0752)
Title
Public Health - Giving Infants a Future Without Transmission (GIFT) Act
Sponsor
Chair, Finance Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0332 /CH0923 (HB0084/CH0922)
Title
Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1023 (HB1279)
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Brooks
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1028 /CH0599 (HB1168/CH0600)
Title
Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0084 /CH0922 (SB0332/CH0923) Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law) Delegate Kerr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 922
Health and Government Operations
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0096 /CH0177 (SB0117/CH0178) Health - Newborn Screening Program - Implementation of Testing Delegate Morgan, T. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 177
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0119 /CH0752 (SB0211) Public Health - Giving Infants a Future Without Transmission (GIFT) Act Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 752
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0210 Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use and Electric–Ready Standards Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/14 at 1:15 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
Economic Matters
HB0249 Public Safety - Statewide DNA Database System, DNA Collection, and Penalties - Alterations Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1168 /CH0600 (SB1028/CH0599) Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act) Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 600
Health and Government Operations
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1279 (SB1023) Maryland Building Performance Standards - Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric- and Solar-Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0117 /CH0178 (HB0096/CH0177) Health - Newborn Screening Program - Implementation of Testing Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 178
Finance
2/16/2024 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0211 (HB0119/CH0752) Public Health - Giving Infants a Future Without Transmission (GIFT) Act Chair, Finance Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0332 /CH0923 (HB0084/CH0922) Hospitals and Urgent Care Centers - Sepsis Protocol (Lochlin's Law) Senator Lewis Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 923
Finance
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1023 (HB1279) Maryland Building Performance Standards – Fossil Fuel Use, Energy Conservation, and Electric– and Solar–Ready Standards (Better Buildings Act of 2024) Senator Brooks 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/04/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1028 /CH0599 (HB1168/CH0600) Human Remains - Alkaline Hydrolysis and Natural Organic Reduction (Green Death Care Options Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 599
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:44 PM
Click to return on the top page